U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05027
  • Case Name: Kirby v. Nelnet, Inc./U.S. Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Generic]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a)]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Generic]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Request]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.