U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20154
  • Case Name: Larry Wayne Jordan, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Intended Compromise]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.