U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20138
  • Case Name: Christopher Scott Odle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Decree]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.