U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20262
  • Case Name: Henry Lee Graham, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Service]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.