U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11299
  • Case Name: Michael H Parrott and Connie J Parrott
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Withdraw Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.