U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10013
  • Case Name: Shannon Kathleen Russell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Online Payment of Fee]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Withdraw Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Turnover]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.