U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40671
  • Case Name: Renita May Fondren-Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice To Allow Claims]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.