U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20726
  • Case Name: Francisca Caroline-Wanjir Njoroge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.