U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40506
  • Case Name: Anita Marletta Daniels
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Release Wages]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Upon Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.