U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10221
  • Case Name: LaDawn K Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Change of Address]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amended Schedules]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Intent]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule J]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule I]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule H]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule G]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule E/F]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule D]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule C]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule A/B]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.