U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20314
  • Case Name: Premier Tillage, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expediting Hearing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request for Notice]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Adequate Protection]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [United States Trustee Meeting Report (Concluded)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Cash Collateral]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Debtor-In-Possession To Pay Taxes]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expediting Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Cash Collateral]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.