U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10135
  • Case Name: Gary Lee Pelser and Donnita Kay Pelser
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.