U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10227
  • Case Name: Brian Joseph Schierkolk and Tonya Maria Schierkolk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Redeem]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Declination]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Debtor's Rebuttal of Presumption of Abuse]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.