U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10224
  • Case Name: Margaret Louene Bacon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Support Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Support Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.