U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10158
  • Case Name: Carol R Flatterich
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.