U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10237
  • Case Name: Dustin Charles Byler and Christina Karen Byler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Generic Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Closing Information]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Closing Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.