U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21410
  • Case Name: Kimberly Susanne Stegeman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.