U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-07006
  • Case Name: Hamilton v. Laird Noller Automotive, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
  • April 03, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.