U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40141
  • Case Name: Regina Rae Robertson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.