U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20319
  • Case Name: Kathleen Sue Adams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.