U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-10032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quinones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.