U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40143
  • Case Name: Jewell Edward Williams, III, et vi and Jewell E. Williams, III, Estate
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Returned Mail]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismissing Case - All Debtors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.