U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40142
  • Case Name: Roszina Jones and Jewell E. Williams, III, Estate
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Returned Mail]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Flags Set-Reset]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Show Cause]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Debtor-In-Possession To Pay Taxes]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.