U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20324
  • Case Name: LaSean Renee Dowd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.