U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10161
  • Case Name: Stephanie Ann Austin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.