U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11183
  • Case Name: James Robert Dixon, II and Mary Helen Simon-Dixon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.