U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10129
  • Case Name: Cylie June Gillespie-Vandyke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.