U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40784
  • Case Name: Casey Michael Shutts and Nicole Michelle Shutts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Default On Conditional Order for Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.