U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20331
  • Case Name: Josephine Cruz Lugovskyy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7A]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.