U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02073
  • Case Name: Anthony v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.