U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21506
  • Case Name: Michael Lynn Christie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Reinstate Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Vacate]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Reinstate Case]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Vacate]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.