U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20335
  • Case Name: Tandra Renee Jackson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Set (Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Support Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Support Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Intent]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule J]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule I]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule H]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule G]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule E/F]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule D]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule C]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule A/B]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.