U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40148
  • Case Name: Chanelle Renee Ludwig
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.