U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20255
  • Case Name: Justin John Cox and Melinda Sue Cox
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refund]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refunds]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refunds]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.