U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20319
  • Case Name: Charles Lee Peterson, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.