U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20334
  • Case Name: Robert James Gaston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.