U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20333
  • Case Name: Donna Denise Winton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.