U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10502
  • Case Name: Devin Shayne Callon and Anna Nichole Callon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice To Allow Claims]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.