U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21550
  • Case Name: Belinda Denise Hollins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Decree]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay-Denied]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.