U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10230
  • Case Name: Jason Lynn Catron and Shelly Dawn Catron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.