U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20737
  • Case Name: Angela Eugenia Cuadros
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice to Allow Claims]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [File Out of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order Due]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.