U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04112
  • Case Name: Brown v. University of Kansas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.