U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40076
  • Case Name: Cathrine Elizabeth Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [D.Kan.LBR 3001.1(D)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.