U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20339
  • Case Name: Terrence Raynald Jackson, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule A]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Support Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.