U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20015
  • Case Name: Brian Patrick Poterbin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.