U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10233
  • Case Name: Blake Markus Withrow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.