U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40094
  • Case Name: Timothy Dennis Lehnherr and Kiara Brooke Lehnherr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.