U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20179
  • Case Name: Gabriel Wyatt Parker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.