U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10085
  • Case Name: Bryan Edward Hicks and Rebecca Sue Hicks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.