U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10081
  • Case Name: Kathryn Marie Palacios
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [File Out of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [File Out of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.